House | 05/18/2015 | File Number 855 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 533 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7199 | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | File Number 750 | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | House Calendar Number 493 | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |