House
|
06/03/2015
|
Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9450
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
File Number 683
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
House Calendar Number 448
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/27
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|