House
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Public Act 15-182
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 564
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 594
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 384
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/16
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|