House | 05/19/2015 | File Number 857 | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/18/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | File Number 732 | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 464 | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |