House | 04/14/2015 | File Number 631 | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | House Calendar Number 401 | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |