House | 06/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Public Act 15-132 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 553 | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 684 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 449 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |