House | 05/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 477 | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | File Number 538 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | House Calendar Number 345 | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |