House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 686 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 451 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |