House | 06/30/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Public Act 15-133 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 440 | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | File Number 597 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | House Calendar Number 387 | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |