House | 05/14/2015 | File Number 819 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | House Calendar Number 546 | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |