Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-215
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C,D,E
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B,C,D,E
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
File Number 922
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 626
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C,D,E
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 8188
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule E 8610
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule D 8449
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8503
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7213
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6842
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
File Number 770
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 599
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
House Calendar Number 389
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|