House | 05/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 634 | ||
House | 05/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/30/2015 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | File Number 689 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | House Calendar Number 454 | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |