House | 04/23/2015 | File Number 733 | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | House Calendar Number 466 | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Public Hearing 03/23 | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |