House | 05/05/2015 | File Number 761 | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | House Calendar Number 497 | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Public Hearing 04/06 | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |