House | 06/01/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 648 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8532 | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | File Number 775 | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | House Calendar Number 504 | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Public Hearing 04/02 | ||
House | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |