Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07058 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7058
22 January Session, 2015 LCO No. 6198
33 *06198_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 7058
1111
1212 January Session, 2015
1313
1414 LCO No. 6198
1515
1616 *06198_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING THE HOSPITAL TAX.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 12-263b of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective January 1, 2017):
2929
3030 (a) (1) For each calendar quarter commencing on or after July 1, 2011, but prior to January 1, 2021, there is hereby imposed a tax on the net patient revenue of each hospital in this state to be paid each calendar quarter. [The] Except as provided in subdivision (2) of this subsection, the rate of such tax shall be up to the maximum rate allowed under federal law. The Commissioner of Social Services shall determine the base year on which such tax shall be assessed. The Commissioner of Social Services may, in consultation with the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management and in accordance with federal law, exempt a hospital from the tax on payment earned for the provision of outpatient services based on financial hardship. Effective July 1, 2012, and for the succeeding fifteen months, the rates of such tax, the base year on which such tax shall be assessed [,] and the hospitals exempt from the outpatient portion of the tax based on financial hardship shall be the same tax rates, base year and outpatient exemption for hardship in effect on January 1, 2012.
3131
3232 (2) For the calendar year commencing January 1, 2017, the annual amount of tax imposed on a hospital shall be equal to eighty per cent of the amount of tax imposed on the hospital during the fiscal year commencing July 1, 2012. For the calendar year commencing January 1, 2018, the annual amount of tax imposed on a hospital shall be equal to sixty per cent of the amount of tax imposed on the hospital during the fiscal year commencing July 1, 2012. For the calendar year commencing January 1, 2019, the annual amount of tax imposed on a hospital shall be equal to forty per cent of the amount of tax imposed on the hospital during the fiscal year commencing July 1, 2012. For the calendar year commencing January 1, 2020, the annual amount of tax imposed on a hospital shall be equal to twenty per cent of the amount of tax imposed on the hospital during the fiscal year commencing July 1, 2012. For the calendar year commencing January 1, 2021, and each calendar year thereafter, no tax shall be imposed pursuant to this section.
3333
3434 (b) Each hospital shall, on or before the last day of January, April, July and October of each year, until February 1, 2021, render to the Commissioner of Revenue Services a return, on forms prescribed or furnished by the Commissioner of Revenue Services and signed by one of its principal officers, stating specifically the name and location of such hospital, and the amount of its net patient revenue as determined by the Commissioner of Social Services. Payment shall be made with such return. Each hospital shall file such return electronically with the department and make such payment by electronic funds transfer in the manner provided by chapter 228g, irrespective of whether the hospital would otherwise have been required to file such return electronically or to make such payment by electronic funds transfer under the provisions of chapter 228g.
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4040 Section 1 January 1, 2017 12-263b
4141
4242 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4343
4444 Section 1
4545
4646 January 1, 2017
4747
4848 12-263b
4949
5050 Statement of Purpose:
5151
5252 To phase out the hospital tax on net patient revenue over a five-year period.
5353
5454 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]