Senate | 07/08/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 07/08/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 07/07/2015 | Public Act 15-2 | ||
Senate | 06/30/2015 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
Senate | 06/29/2015 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/29/2015 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
House | 06/29/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9739 | ||
House | 06/29/2015 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9727 | ||
House | 06/27/2015 | Emergency Certification |