Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 660 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8319 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 540 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 330 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |