Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 144 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 152 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 | ||
Senate | 01/22/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |