Senate | 05/21/2015 | House Calendar Number 580 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | File Number 290 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 221 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |