Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 330 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 237 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Vote to Draft |