Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
Public Act 15-220
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 638
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6710
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
File Number 653
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 377
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|