Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
House Calendar Number 473
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6304
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 484
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 304
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|