Senate | 04/02/2015 | Public Hearing 04/06 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 01/20/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |