Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Public Act 15-100
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 606
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
File Number 861
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/18/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
File Number 757
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
File Number 485
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 301
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|