Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 601
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 337
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|