Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | File Number 192 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 168 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Vote to Draft |