Senate | 06/02/2015 | Senate Recommitted to Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | File Number 64 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 102 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Public Hearing 01/29 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |