Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 146 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 143 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/10 |