LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2015 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00303
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00303
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2015 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00303
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 20, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 10, 2015
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 12, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 30, 2015
Compare
Bill
April 8, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 23, 2015
Compare
Bill
February 25, 2015
Compare