Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Vote to Draft |