Connecticut 2015 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00344 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/21/2015

                            General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 344
January Session, 2015  LCO No. 1234
 *01234*
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
Introduced by:
SEN. BOUCHER, 26th Dist.

General Assembly

Proposed Bill No. 344 

January Session, 2015

LCO No. 1234

*01234*

Referred to Committee on EDUCATION 

Introduced by:

SEN. BOUCHER, 26th Dist.

AN ACT CONCERNING THE PHASE IN OF THE COMMON CORE STATE STANDARDS AND SMARTER BALANCED ASSESSMENT.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

That title 10 of the general statutes be amended to phase in implementation of the common core state standards and Smarter Balanced assessments as follows: (1) For the school year commencing July 1, 2015, and each school year thereafter, grades kindergarten to three, inclusive, (2) for the school year commencing July 1, 2017, and each school year thereafter, grades kindergarten to six, inclusive, (3) for the school year commencing July 1, 2019, and each school year thereafter, grades kindergarten to nine, inclusive, and (4) for the school year commencing July 1, 2021, and each school year thereafter, grades kindergarten to twelve, inclusive.

Statement of Purpose: 

To phase in the common core state standards and Smarter Balanced assessments in the public schools.