Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 645 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8058 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 543 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 317 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Vote to Draft |