Senate | 04/23/2015 | File Number 735 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | New File by Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Children | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 246 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 187 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |