Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 646 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | File Number 869 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/19/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 248 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 191 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Vote to Draft |