Senate | 05/29/2015 | House Calendar Number 647 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7983 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | File Number 249 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 196 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |