Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Special Act 15-11
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House Calendar Number 583
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
File Number 253
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 201
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|