Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House Calendar Number 662
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8508
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
File Number 546
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 324
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|