Senate | 05/15/2015 | House Calendar Number 553 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | File Number 547 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 325 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |