Senate | 06/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Public Act 15-33 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | House Calendar Number 478 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | File Number 654 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 375 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |