Senate | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |