Senate | 05/21/2015 | House Calendar Number 585 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | No New File by Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | File Number 332 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 244 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/06/2015 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |