Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Public Act 15-41
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
House Calendar Number 522
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6970
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
File Number 334
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 246
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|