Senate | 04/08/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | File Number 430 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 282 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Public Hearing 02/09 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |