Senate | 03/23/2015 | File Number 148 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 158 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/17 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |