Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 608
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
File Number 90
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 126
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|