Senate | 05/14/2015 | File Number 821 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 498 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/15 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2015 | Vote to Draft |