Senate | 05/06/2015 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | File Number 607 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Senate Calendar Number 339 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 03/06/2015 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/13/2015 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |