Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Public Act 15-186
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 609
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
File Number 609
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 341
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2015
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|