Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House Calendar Number 629
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8124
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8065
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8070
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8069
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8077
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
File Number 293
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Senate Calendar Number 226
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2015
|
Public Hearing 01/29
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2015
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|